FL H1299 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides powers & duties related to autonomous physician assistants, including training, licensure, reporting, liability, & reimbursement; provides duties of DOH & Council on Physician Assistants; authorizes certain health care practitioners to perform certain examinations; provides criminal penalties; revises requirements for reimbursement of pharmacies; revises provisions relating to Child Protection Teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Physician Assistants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H431 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Message sent to senate
S894 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 431

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200848Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397679Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976793Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009974Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009976Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7443675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback