FL H1297 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person who drives vehicle at or above specified speed commits reckless driving; revises threshold above posted speed limit at which person in violation of certain provisions must be cited for moving violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving Over the Speed Limit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1414 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31817Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3220261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337195Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback