FL H1297 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires audit plans of inspector general to include certain information; revises provisions to replace references to IT & computer security with references to cybersecurity; provides & revises requirements for DMS, acting through Florida Digital Service; creates Florida Cybersecurity Advisory Council within DMS; providing purpose of council.
Title
Cybersecurity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#161 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#161 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-234 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1900 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-06 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-01 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1900 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1297 (Ch. 2021-234)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |