FL H1293 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for licensure as lessor, manufacturer, or operator of preview games; requires DBPR to license & regulate preview games, & lessors, manufacturers, & operators thereof.
Title
Amusement Games or Machines
Sponsors
Rep. Al Jacquet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1802 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1293 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1293/BillText/Filed/PDF |