FL H1291 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes citrus producers to use specified recommendations to tailor nutrient application rates; requires producers to keep records & to enroll in & implement best management practices; requires recommendations for nutrient application rates by state universities & Florida College System institutions to provide application ranges & authorizations; provides presumption of compliance with certain requirements for citrus producers; directs UF/IFAS to analyze use of site-specific nutrient management for certain crops, develop research plan & recommendations, & submit annual report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Nutrient Application Rates
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Environment, Agriculture and Flooding Subcommittee | Rep. Lawrence McClure [R] | Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000 |
2022-02-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-17 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-02-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-177
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |