FL H1287 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain insurance records & critical energy infrastructure information held by local government & records which contain network schematics, hardware & software configurations, or encryption or which identify suspected or confirmed information technology security incidents; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of public meetings which would reveal such information; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Local Government Security

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14HouseDied in State Affairs Committee
2022-03-12HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2022-02-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2022-02-11HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-02-11HouseOriginal reference removed: Commerce Committee
2022-02-09House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2022-02-09HouseCS Filed
2022-02-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-02-09HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-02-08HouseFavorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-02-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-02-04HousePCS added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2022-02-04HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-02-04HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-02-04HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-02-04HouseCS Filed
2022-02-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-02-03HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-03HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-12HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1740 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback