FL H1283 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Renames & transfers rights, powers, responsibilities, & obligations from Tampa-Hillsborough County Expressway Authority to West Florida Expressway Authority; revises governing body membership & terms; expands boundaries; authorizes construction of facilities; limits use of toll revenues; removes provisions relating to interest on gasoline tax funds repaid to Hillsborough County; revises powers of authority; revises projects approved for financing; revises provisions relating to pledge of surplus gasoline tax funds; repeals provisions relating to consultation with Hillsborough County City-County Planning Commission & design standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tampa-Hillsborough County Expressway Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-05HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-05HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-02HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1660 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
343975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34850Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34851Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34852Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34853Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34854Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34856Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34857Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34858Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34859Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34860Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34863Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34864Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34865Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34867Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34868Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348681Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348682Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34870Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback