FL H1283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements for rental agreements; requires landlord provide written notice of certain options by specified time; removes option for landlord to deposit certain money into specified account; revises notice requirements to tenants; provides for damages; requires inspection of dwelling unit to ensure compliance with applicable codes; requires certain records be removed from tenant's credit report; removes requirement that certain money be paid into registry of court; prohibits landlord from engaging in certain conduct; requires landlord to give tenants purchase options on dwelling unit or premises; provides requirements for terminating rental agreement; authorizes filing of civil action & award of damages, court costs, & attorney fees.
Title
Landlords and Tenants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1794 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1283 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1283/BillText/Filed/PDF |