FL H1283 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Chapter No. 2013-264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Chapter No. 2013-264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for special alcoholic beverage licenses within Nassau County.
Title
Nassau County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Chapter No. 2013-264 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2013-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-26 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13 |
2013-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-22 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/22/13, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |