FL H1281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOT to acquire Garcon Point Bridge for certain price; provides for settlement of claims of certain bondholders; provides for termination of certain lease-purchase agreement; provides toll requirements; provides certain appropriations authority; requires deposit of certain funds into State Transportation Trust Fund; repeals certain provisions; requires notification to Division of Law Revision & Information upon completion of acquisition.
Title
Garcon Point Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-26 | House | CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-02-13 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1436 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
339 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |