FL H1281 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Reenacts reference to certain federal laws for purposes of incorporating rules adopted under such laws; specifies application of disciplinary procedures to principal loan originators for actions of loan originators; specifies nonapplication of specified limitations to licensed loan originators operating solely as loan processors; prohibits acting as loan processor unless licensed as loan originator, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan Origination [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0005 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House Roll Call No. 0778 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-67
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-21 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00841
2010-04-16 Received -SJ 00649; Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce -SJ 00649; Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce -SJ 00623; Substituted for CS/SB 2548 -SJ 00623; Read 2nd time -SJ 00623; Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00623
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 00688; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00688; CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00688; Immediately certified -HJ 00714
2010-04-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00668
2010-03-26 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00409
2010-03-25 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00409
2010-03-23 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/25/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-03-16 Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to General Government Policy Council -HJ 00300; Now in General Government Policy Council
2010-03-15 CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00278; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-11 CS by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00280
2010-03-09 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/11/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-03 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00205
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00116
2010-02-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2548 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; Substituted CS/HB 1281 -SJ 00623; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2010-67) -SJ 00623

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
049400255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
049400331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
049400335New CodeSee Bill Text
04940038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04940067Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1281&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb128100.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb128101c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb128102e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB12810415100778.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB12810416100005.html

Bill Comments

feedback