FL H1277 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises duties of district school boards relating to student discipline & school safety & qualifications of school resource officer & school safety officer; requires district school board to adopt policy on referrals to criminal justice system or juvenile justice system, rather than policy of zero tolerance for crime & victimization.
Title
Student Discipline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1724 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1277 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1277/BillText/Filed/PDF |