FL H1275 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides penalties for vessel operators who leave scene of vessel accident that causes damage, injury, or death without complying with certain requirements, who operate vessel in reckless or careless manner & cause serious bodily injury, or who operate vessel while under influence & cause death of unborn child; provides mandatory minimum sentencing for specified violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vessel Collisions, Accidents, and Casualties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee(Amended)
2021-03-22HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1834 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
782072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback