FL H1275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to preemption of pest control regulation to state; prohibits county, municipality, or other local political subdivision from adopting or enforcing local ordinance, special law, or local regulation governing pest control which is less stringent than general law or agency rule.
Title
Pest Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
482 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 244 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1275 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1275/BillText/Filed/PDF |