FL H1269 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits greyhound racing permitholders from conducting live greyhound racing or dogracing; requires thoroughbred permitholder to conduct live thoroughbred racing; authorizes specified permitholders to elect to conduct live harness horse racing; authorizes Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering to approve certain changes to operating dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pari-mutuel Wagering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1794 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback