FL H1269 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits greyhound racing permitholders from conducting live greyhound racing or dogracing; requires thoroughbred permitholder to conduct live thoroughbred racing; authorizes specified permitholders to elect to conduct live harness horse racing; authorizes Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering to approve certain changes to operating dates.
Title
Pari-mutuel Wagering
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-21 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1794 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries