FL H1267 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person from operating branch of business making consumer finance loans before authorized to do so & obtaining license from OFR; revises maximum interest rate on consumer finance loans; revises minimum amount of time before which delinquency charge for each payment in default may be imposed; requires licensees offering assistance program to borrowers after federally declared major disaster to send notice to office; requires licensees to file annual reports; requires licensees to suspend specified actions for after federally declared disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Finance Loans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#313 (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-26 Vetoed by Governor
2023-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2023-05-01HouseIn Messages
2023-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 9
2023-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-01SenateAmendment(s) failed (157894)
2023-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2023-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 580
2023-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Fiscal Policy
2023-04-27SenateReceived
2023-04-27SenateReferred to Fiscal Policy
2023-04-27SenateIn Messages
2023-04-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 96, NAYS 18
2023-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-24HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
2023-04-21HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-21HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2023-04-20HouseCS Filed
2023-04-20HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-04-19HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2023-04-18HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2023-04-13HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2023-04-12HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2023-04-12HouseReported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-04-12HouseFavorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-04-10HouseAdded to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-28HouseNow in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-28HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-27HouseCS Filed
2023-03-27HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-27HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-27HouseFavorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-23HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-06HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-06HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S580 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
516031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51638Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51639Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Amendment/568167/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Amendment/157894/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Amendment/906926/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267a.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267b.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267c.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267z.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Analyses/h1267z1.IBS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=67847&IsPCB=0&BillId=78056
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68979&IsPCB=0&BillId=78056
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=69262&IsPCB=0&BillId=78056
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Vote/HouseVote_h01267c2313.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1267/Vote/SenateVote_h01267c2031.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback