FL H1265 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Education Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Education Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 5, Art. IX of State Constitution to require that district school superintendent be elected by voters in school districts having student population of 300,000 or more, thereby precluding in such districts option of school board or law approved by electors to provide for appointment of superintendent.
Title
Election of Superintendent of Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Education Policy Council | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Education Policy Council; Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00205 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00114 | |
2010-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2178 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12