FL H1263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may obtain expunction of criminal history record if it has been more than specified period since persons has been adjudicated guilty of any specified offenses & meets specified requirements; provides that person may obtain sealing of criminal history record if it has been more than specified period since prior sealing or expunction.
Title
Expunction and Sealing of Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1263 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1263/BillText/Filed/PDF |