FL H1261 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises terminology relating to election ballots; transfers to new subsection requirements applicable to joint resolutions; provides that joint resolution may include ballot summary or alternate ballot summaries, listed in order of preference, describing chief purpose of amendment or revision in clear & unambiguous language; requires joint resolution to specify placement on ballot of ballot title & either ballot summary embodied in joint resolution or full text of proposed amendment or revision, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Ballots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#277 (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-26 In Messages
2011-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 750
2011-04-20 Read 2nd time -HJ 713
2011-04-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/20/11
2011-04-15 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-14 CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 -HJ 660
2011-04-12 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-04-08 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-07 CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 -HJ 601
2011-04-05 PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2011-03-14 Referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 220
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 114
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback