FL H1259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to use proceeds & interest of local government infrastructure surtax to maintain transportation infrastructure under specified circumstances.
Title
Discretionary Sales Surtaxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1259 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1259/BillText/Filed/PDF |