FL H1259 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 5, Art. XI of State Constitution to require amendments to or revisions of State Constitution to be presented to voters in form & manner prescribed by general law enacted by Legislature.
Title
Constitutional Amendments/Presentation to Electors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 220 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 114 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1259 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1259/BillText/Filed/HTML |