FL H1257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires OPPAGA to conduct study of prevalence & effects of lead in drinking water in public schools; specifies information that must be included in study; requires OPPAGA to consult with district school boards, district boards, & other interested entities; requires OPPAGA to submit study to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides for future repeal.
Title
Drinking Water in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S834 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1257 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1257/BillText/Filed/PDF |