FL H1255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers law enforcement duties of Inspector General of DOC to FDLE; removes provisions relating to law enforcement certification & powers of Inspector General Personnel.
Title
Duties of the Inspector General of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1255 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1255/BillText/Filed/PDF |