FL H1255 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to states amendment to Constitution of United States which would increase number of senators to three in any state that has population of more than 6 million as determined by census.
Title
Composition of the Senate of the United States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1696 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1255 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1255/BillText/Filed/PDF |