FL H1253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-127, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2019-70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to develop unique identifier for each patient; authorizes AG to introduce as evidence in certain actions specified information from prescription drug monitoring program; authorizes certain individuals to authenticate records; authorizes AG to have access to records for active investigations or pending civil or criminal litigation in certain cases; provides that certain information may only be released pursuant to discovery request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#270 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Chapter No. 2019-127, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2019-70)
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 888
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1700
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-30SenateReceived
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-29SenateIn Messages
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) adopted (264867)
2019-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-24HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (789873)
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-04-17HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-20HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1700 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1253 (Ch. 2019-127)
H375 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-70, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1253 (Ch. 2019-127)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/Amendment/086053/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/Amendment/789873/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/Vote/HouseVote_h01253e1270.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1253/Vote/SenateVote_h01253e2021.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback