FL H1253 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Veterinary Care for Retired Military Working Dogs Program within DVA; requires DVA to contract with nonprofit corporation to administer program; provides selection criteria; provides for disbursement of program funds; provides for payment & use of administrative fees; provides appropriation.
Title
Veterinary Care for Retired Military Working Dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1253 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1253/BillText/Filed/PDF |