FL H1247 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-259

Summary

Authorizes Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco of DBPR to issue alcoholic beverage license to Children's Museum of Tampa, Inc.; provides that license may be used only for special events; provides for payment of license fee; prohibits sales for consumption off premises; authorizes transfer & provides for subsequent reversion of license under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hillsborough County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-259
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01286
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00947; Read 3rd time -SJ 00947; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00947
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00870; Referred to Rules -SJ 00870
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00937; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00937
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00912
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762
2010-04-16 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-18 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00343
2010-03-17 Favorable by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00343
2010-03-15 CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00278; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC) -HJ 00279; On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/17/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-10 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 11 NAYS 1 -HJ 00280
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-03 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00205
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00112
2010-02-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2510 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1247 (Ch. 2010-259)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback