FL H1243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies confidential or exempt information obtained by elder abuse fatality review team retains protected status; provides exemption from public records requirements for specified information in records held by review team; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of review team meetings during which specified information is discussed; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Elder Abuse Fatality Review Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-18 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-17 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Original reference removed: Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-04 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1594 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs