FL H1243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that hospital submits specified information to AG Office for hospital or group practice mergers, acquisitions, & other transactions in certain timeframes; provides requirements for such notice; requires AG to submit biennial reports to Legislature; establishes penalty; provides that certain restrictive covenants are void & unenforceable for specified period; authorizes positions & provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital or Group Practice Mergers, Acquisitions, and Other Transactions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#63 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04HouseReferred to- Calendar
2019-04-04HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-02HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/02/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-21HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S882 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 843
H843 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
542195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
542275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
542336Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback