FL H1233 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases annual gross sales limitation for exempting cottage food operations from certain food & building permitting requirements; authorizes certain advertisement & sale of, & payment for, cottage food products; prohibits certain delivery of cottage food products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cottage Food Operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#83 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24 Chapter No. 2017-32
2017-05-23 Approved by Governor
2017-05-08 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-04-27SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1136
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-04-13SenateReceived
2017-04-13SenateReferred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-04-12SenateIn Messages
2017-04-05HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2017-04-05HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-04HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-29HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
2017-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/29/17, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2017-03-21HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-03-21HouseFavorable by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1136 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1233 (Ch. 2017-32)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50080Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback