FL H1233 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exceptions from provisions limiting liability of Citizens Property Insurance Corporation & its officers, employees, & agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2014-03-11HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1508 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627351Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback