FL H1229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county recorder or clerk of the court to make publicly available on an Internet website the identity of a respondent against whom a final judgment for an injunction for the protection of a minor is entered, as well as the fact that the final judgment injunction for the protection of a minor has been entered; requiring each county recorder or clerk of the court to post a certain notice on the Internet website and in the office of the county recorder or clerk of the court; authorizing certain persons to petition the circuit court for compliance; requiring that final judgments for injunctions for protection be recorded in official records, etc.
Title
Public Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#417 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#211 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#211 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-231 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 431400 Concur |
2021-04-29 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (431400) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1508 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Original reference removed: Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-31 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-31 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1508 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1229 (Ch. 2021-231)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |