FL H1225 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies information that must be sought before financing agreement is approved; specifies that failure of property owner to disclose specified information does not invalidate financing agreement; specifies information that must be verified for residential properties; specifies how fair market value is derived; requires program administrator to orally provide specified information to property owner; requires local governments to develop written disclosure form; specifies prohibited actions related to program administrators; specifies actions which will render certain contracts unenforceable; requires an annual report.
Title
Improvements to Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1858 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1225 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1225/BillText/Filed/PDF |