FL H1223 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits employers from excluding applicants from initial interviews for employment under certain conditions; provides applicability & exceptions; requires DEO to enforce act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background Screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H51 (Same As) 2017-11-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S798 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43513Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback