FL H1223 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs, in coordination with Building Homes for Heroes, to purchase foreclosed homes for eligible injured veterans of U.S. Armed Forces; authorizes program to provide specified types of assistance; provides eligibility criteria; requires review of financial transactions of program; authorizes department to adopt rules to administer program; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Foreclosed Homes for the Brave Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29524Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback