FL H1217 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes hospitals, emergency medical services stations, & fire stations to use newborn safety devices to accept surrendered newborn infants under certain circumstances; requires such entities to visually check & test device within specified timeframes; adds locations under which prohibition on initiation of criminal investigations based solely on surrendering of newborn infant applies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surrendered Newborn Infants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#548 (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#516 (Y: 42 N: 68 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 2
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseAmendment(s) failed (325181)
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S864 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
630423Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback