FL H1215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for civil citations for possession of small amounts of cannabis & cannabis paraphernalia offenses; provides for community service in lieu of fines; limits number of civil citations that person may receive; provides person who contests violation waives specified civil penalty & may receive larger penalty; revises principle of Criminal Punishment Code relating to prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment & incentive gain-time that DOC may grant.
Title
Revising Penalties for Nonviolent Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Caruso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S472 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H235 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1032 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
H235 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1032 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1215 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1215/BillText/Filed/PDF |