FL H1215 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires retail tire dealers to disclose to purchasers age of replacement tires & certain warnings relating to age of tires; provides certain exceptions; provides that violation of act is deceptive & unfair trade practice; provides for deposit & use of certain funds; requires Attorney General's office to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-14 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 220
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 107
2011-03-04 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback