FL H1211 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires commercial airboat operators to have specified documents onboard; provides exception & penalty; directs FWCC to adopt rules by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airboat Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#812 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-137
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 1020
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1612
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-03-06SenateReceived
2018-03-06SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 1
2018-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-02-22HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-05HouseCS referred to Government Accountability Committee; Commerce Committee
2018-02-05HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
2018-02-02HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1612 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1211

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
327391Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback