FL H1207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises membership of pediatric cardiac technical advisory panel to include certain alternate at-large members; authorizes Secretary of Health Care Administration to consult panel for advisory recommendations on certain certificate-of-need applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pediatric Cardiac Technical Advisory Panel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1126 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback