FL H1205 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ratifies specified rules relating to number of HMO plans that DMS contracts with in each region for sole & exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Group Insurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-20HouseReported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-20HouseFavorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseAdded to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-12HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1456 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback