FL H1203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises district boundaries; requires referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lakewood Ranch Stewardship District, Manatee and Sarasota Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#279 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-180
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled 1157
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenateReceived
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-29SenateIn Messages
2019-04-29HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-04-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-04-11HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback