FL H1203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that possession of personal use quantity of cannabis or cannabis accessory by adult or minor is civil violation; provides for fines or community service; requires minor violators to perform community service, attend drug awareness program, or both; prohibits arrests; limits collateral use of violation; prohibits state or local penalties or obligations other than specified penalties or obligations; prohibits additional state or local penalties or obligations for having cannabinoids or cannabinoid metabolites in tissue or fluid of body; provides for distribution of revenue from civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1602 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
831311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback