FL H1203 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises boundaries; provides for five-member board; provides for ad valorem assessments & non-ad valorem assessments, & impact fees; deletes schedule of non-ad valorem assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cedar Hammock Fire Control District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#333 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-197
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-15HouseCS/CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS/CS/CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-04-09HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-04-08HouseCS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time
2015-04-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-27HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-26HouseCS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-25HouseCS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-01HouseFiled

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/Amendment/609397/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/Amendment/298275/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/Amendment/072711/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/Vote/HouseVote_h1203c3333.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1203/Vote/SenateVote_h1203c3021.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback