FL H1197 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Pari-mutuel site redevelopment trust fund within DEO; provides purpose, funding, administration & future review & termination of re-creation.
Title
Trust Fund/Creation/Pari-mutuel Site Redevelopment Trust Fund/DEO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Gaming Control Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1195 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Gaming Control Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1197 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1197/BillText/Filed/PDF |