FL H1197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes state universities & Florida College System institutions to sponsor charter schools; revises reporting & accountability requirements; provides for funding; authorizes career & professional academy to be offered by charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#247 (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 74 NAYS 37
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) failed (021065, 420853)
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (511401, 516945)
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-04-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-04-05HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-04-04HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-02HouseCS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 10
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/02/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1668 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
H7095 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003493Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/497665/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/909703/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/511401/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/420853/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/021065/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/516945/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/335899/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Amendment/407497/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1197/Vote/HouseVote_h01197c2247.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback