FL H1195 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises term "home medical equipment provider" to exclude medical practices owned by certain licensed physicians & specified family members.
Title
Home Medical Equipment Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1134 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1195 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1195/BillText/Filed/PDF |