FL H1193 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to waive the requirement to pass the Commercial Driver License Skills Tests for certain servicemembers and veterans; specifying that the failure to repay certain student loans is not considered a failure to perform a statutory or legal obligation for which certain disciplinary action can be taken; deleting the requirement that the Florida State Boxing Commission adopt rules relating to a knockdown timekeeper; revising the membership and qualifications of the Florida Building Commission, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deregulation of Professions and Occupations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#752 (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#584 (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-160
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 103 NAYS 11
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (380064)
2020-03-12HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-12SenateAmendment(s) adopted (380064)
2020-03-12SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-12SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 474
2020-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-12SenateWithdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 88 NAYS 25
2020-03-09HouseAmendment(s) adopted (060661)
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (672911) 863
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2020-02-24HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-20HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H707 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S474 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1193
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H77 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H115 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-125
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S66 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
S356 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 115
S926 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H5401 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
326004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4552278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4688314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
471015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
473308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
474217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
476144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4812131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4812251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481229Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
481329Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
548017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55374Amended CodeSee Bill Text
558002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82315Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/e3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/Amendment/122033/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/Vote/HouseVote_h01193e1584.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/Vote/SenateVote_h01193e2024.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1193/Vote/HouseVote_h01193e2752.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback