FL H1191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "financial institution" to include certain medical marijuana limited charter banks or credit unions; establishes Medical Marijuana Limited Charter Bank & Credit Union Advisory Board within OFR; provides duties of DOH & board; requires medical marijuana limited charter bank or credit union license for certain purposes; prohibits transfer or assignment of licenses; provides application requirements; requires commission to adopt rules, & authorizing commission to adopt emergency rules; provides requirements for medical marijuana limited charter banks & credit unions; provides authorized & prohibited acts by medical marijuana limited charter banks & credit unions.
Title
Banking Services for Medical Marijuana Treatment Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1116 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
655 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1191 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1191/BillText/Filed/PDF |